Dogfen lywodraethu Sherbrook Primary School PTFA

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 NOVEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED 11 MARCH 1991 AND 30 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2008 as amended on 14 Mar 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL {NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY} AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY: A. FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF , PARENTS, AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND B. ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.