Dogfen lywodraethu CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME (NUNEATON & BEDWORTH AND NORTH WARWICKSHIRE BRANCH)
Rhif yr elusen: 513042
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED 14 JUNE 1983 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 1988, 12 AUGUST 1997 AND 21 JULY 1998.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS AND PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY BASED CARE ATTENDANTS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
THE BOROUGHS OF NUNEATON AND BEDWORTH AND NORTH WARWICKSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.