Dogfen lywodraethu THE FRIENDS OF SHREWSBURY MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY
Rhif yr elusen: 513417

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/12/1982 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2014 as amended on 29 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY ADMINISTERED BY BY SHROPSHIRE COUNCIL MUSEUM SERVICES
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.