Dogfen lywodraethu AGE CONCERN MILLOM AND DISTRICT
Rhif yr elusen: 514070
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 1982 AND AMENDED ON 12 SEPTEMBER 1983 , 27 JUNE 1995, 28 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 18 OCTOBER 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN MILLOM AND DISTRICT IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
MILLOM & DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.