Dogfen lywodraethu TYNEDALE U3A

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCT 1984 AS AMENDED ON 05 FEB 1991 AS AMENDED ON 02 MAR 1999 AS AMENDED ON 05 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 07 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 17 Mar 2020 as amended on 02 Mar 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Maes buddion
TYNEDALE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.