Dogfen lywodraethu NOTTINGHAMSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 515898

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUNE 1984 AS AMENDED 14 NOVEMBER 1984, 21 JUNE 1993, 16 JUNE 1997,19 JUNE 2000 AND 17 JUNE 2002.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC STUDY OF BRITISH FAMILY HISTORY, GENEALOGY, HERALDRY AND LOCAL HISTORY WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO NOTTINGHAMSHIRE. (B) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, SECURTIY AND ACCESSABILITY OF ARCHIVAL MATERIAL.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.