Dogfen lywodraethu APEX LEICESTER PROJECT LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 18 AUGUST 1986, 15 MAY 1996, 7 SEPTEMBER 2000, 9 APRIL 2002 , 17 JULY 2006 AND 3 JANUARY 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION AND RESETTLEMENT OF FORMER OFFENDERS, THOSE DEEMED TO BE AT RISK OF OFFENDING AND OTHERS EITHER DISADVANTAGED BY EXCLUSION FROM THE LABOUR MARKET, OR SEEKING TO IMPROVE THEIR PROSPECTS IN THE LABOUR MARKET, AND TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT POVERTY AMONGST SUCH PERSONS, PARTICULARLY BY MAKING OR FACILITATING ARRANGEMENTS FOR THEIR EMPLOYMENT AND BY THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE TRAINING TO ENABLE THEM TO FIND SUITABLE EMPLOYMENT, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE PERSONS RESIDENT IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Maes buddion
LEICESTERSHIRE & NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.