Dogfen lywodraethu THE NEWCASTLE BRANCH OF THE PLAYGROUP NETWORK
Rhif yr elusen: 519014
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 1980 AS AMENDED 18 MAY 1987, 18 MAY 1988, 18 MAY 1992, 14 OCTOBER 2000 AND 3 DECEMBER 2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE WITHIN THE AREA OF THE CITY OF NEWCASTLE AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS/CARERS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NEWCASTLE AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.