Dogfen lywodraethu THE PROMENADE (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS MERRIONS WOOD)
Rhif yr elusen: 522741

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONVEYANCE DATED 14/01/1924 AND CONVEYANCE DATED 31/12/1940 AS AFFECTED BY SCHEMES DATED 21/11/1987 AND 24/05/1995 AS AMENDED 15/02/2024 as amended on 27 Nov 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
BEAUTY SPOT AND PLACE OF PUBLIC PROMENADE
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
GREAT BARR AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.