Dogfen lywodraethu THE MISS MARSH SCHOLARSHIP FUND FOR LEIGH GIRLS'GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEEDS 22 OCTOBER 1934 4 MAY 1935 11 DECEMBER 1956 SCHEME OF 30 SEPTEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED ON 8 MARCH 2005 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Gwrthrychau elusennol
AWARDING EXHIBITIONS OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY TEACHER TRAINING COLLEGE OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FE APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES TO GIRLS UNDER AGE 25 WHO ARE ATTENDING ANY OF THE FOLLOWING SCHOOLS:BEDFORD HIGH SCHOOL,LEIGH CE HIGH SCOOL,LEIGH COLLEGE,ST MARY'S HIGH SCHOOL,WESTLEIGH HIGH SCHOOL(ALL IN LEIGH),HESKETH FLETCHER HIGH SCHOOL,ATHERTON,LOWTON HIGH SCHOOL,LOWTON OR FRED LONGWORTH HIGH SCHOOL,TYLDESLEY
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF LEIGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.