Dogfen lywodraethu WALTHAM FOREST DISABILITY RESOURCE CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH MARCH 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3RD AUGUST 1988, 30TH NOVEMBER 1996, 2ND AUGUST 2003 AND 9 SEPTEMBER 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WIT PHYSICAL OR SENSORY DISABILITIES RESIDENT IN WALTHAM FOREST BY THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE TO BE KNOWN AS THE WALTHAM FOREST DISABILITY RESOURCE CENTRE THROUGH WHICH SUCH PERSONS MAY REALISE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. THE CENTRE SHALL BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL OR SENSORY DISABILITIES IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR DISABILITY, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RELIGION OR ETHNIC ORIGIN. (2) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
WALTHAM FOREST
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.