Dogfen lywodraethu CHARITY OF ELIZABETH EMAN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 18/6/1935, AS AMENDED BY ORDERS DATED 25/8/1936, AND 17/11/1953, AND SCHEMES DATED 16/8/1961, 2/10/1986, AND 9/11/2004. as amended on 19 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF PENSIONS, IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PREFERENCE: (1) POOR WIDOWS BORN IN THE FORMER BOROUGH OF AYLESBURY AS CONSTITUTED IMMEDIATELY BEFORE 1 APRIL 1974; (2) POOR WIDOWS BORN OR RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (3) POOR WOMEN BORN OR RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (4) POOR MEN BORN OR RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
DISTRICT OF AYLESBURY VALE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.