Dogfen lywodraethu AYLESBURY CONCERT BAND
Rhif yr elusen: 1062069

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED 23 MAY 2007, 13 MAY 2009 AND 26 MAY 2010. as amended on 02 Jun 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS, AND BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN THE PLAYING OF WIND INSTRUMENTS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
IN PRACTICE THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.