Dogfen lywodraethu Gladstone Terrace Centre for Young People
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND ORDER OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR EDUCATION AND SCIENCE OF 6 APRIL 1965 (THE DATE OF ADOPTION OF THE CONSTITUTION IS UNKNOWN) 02 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED ON 06 DEC 2017 as amended on 29 Aug 2023 as amended on 27 Feb 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) TO PRESERVE AND PROVIDE FOR THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING IN THE BOROUGH OF GATESHEAD AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUALITY, DISABILITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE; (2) TO MANAGE AND MAINTAIN A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
GATESHEAD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.