Financial history NO 18 INNER WHEEL DISTRICT COMMITTEE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 1025513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £720 £679 £1.68k £0 £0
Total expenditure £770 £636 £1.73k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A