Financial history THE BETHEL CHURCH

Charity Number: 1052513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £96.82k £125.62k £118.55k £113.14k £119.01k
Total expenditure £108.16k £96.19k £111.91k £113.76k £134.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £923 £66.11k £12.36k N/A N/A