Financial history THE CHELSEA CENTRE LTD

Charity Number: 1060460
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £465.43k £410.58k £612.92k £683.94k £768.38k
Total expenditure £505.41k £577.57k £781.46k £934.75k £905.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £314.44k £350.98k £123.00k £332.02k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £396.17k £483.19k £490.01k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £216.63k £195.76k £271.68k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £118 £5.00k £6.69k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £781.46k £934.75k £905.41k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £32.03k £16.49k £8.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0