Financial history THE GOWER TRUST

Charity Number: 211594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.85k £14.01k £18.01k £16.00k £15.91k
Total expenditure £15.93k £19.11k £14.26k £8.89k £4.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A