Accounts and annual returns THE MAIDSTONE POST-GRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 292529
Charity reporting is up to date (95 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 December 2024 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 February 2025 95 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 February 2024 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 November 2022 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 March 2022 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required