Financial history LODGE OF FIDELITY NO 555, CHARITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.30k £982 £1.66k £2.07k £2.36k
Total expenditure £24.34k £2.90k £1.52k £200 £1.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A