Financial history ITP SUPPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1064480
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £132.01k £95.94k £143.57k £195.98k £151.51k
Total expenditure £124.57k £118.05k £85.43k £138.18k £167.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A