Financial history THE MUSE AT 269

Charity number: 1162300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £16.28k £4.70k £34.55k £46.12k £38.40k
Total expenditure £101.71k £54.37k £179.41k £281.60k £305.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A