Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S SCHOOL HORSHAM
Charity number: 1000327

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Allen | Chair | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Roger Dart | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Clare Smith | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tina Sarll Mrs | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Picton | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma McLaughlin | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lisa Barnett | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hossack | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.