Financial history BRITON FERRY HEALTH CENTRE FUND

Charity number: 1000939
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017
Total gross income £2.24k £225 £26 £421 £1.04k
Total expenditure £1.15k £973 £420 £6.11k £11
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A