Accounts and annual returns YOUNG MUSLIM ORGANISATION UK

Charity Number: 1000956
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 08 November 2012 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 26 February 2012 391 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required