Accounts and annual returns HEXTON J M I SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1001060
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required