Trustees MARCH EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP
Charity number: 1001175
Up to date (83 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT ALWYN FENN | Chair | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Malcom Phillips Harper | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael McCarthy | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Moonira Mojoo | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Fox | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Frederick Wool | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Celia Maskill | Trustee | 26 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN CRANSTOUN | Trustee | 23 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.