Financial history THE WOODLEY GIRL GUIDE TRUST

Charity Number: 1001262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £16.27k £8.12k £16.95k £10.16k £5.55k
Total expenditure £7.69k £3.65k £32.54k £11.82k £4.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A