Accounts and annual returns THE RIMSWELL VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1001266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 February 2023 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 February 2023 475 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 February 2023 840 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required