Accounts and annual returns ILKLEY MUSIC CENTRE ASSOCIATION ( ALSO KNOWN AS THE FRIENDS OF ILKLEY MUSIC CENTRE)

Charity number: 1001352
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2013 01 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2012 04 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2011 08 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 16 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required