Accounts and annual returns THE WAINGELS COPSE SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1001365
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 February 2017 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required