Financial history SOUTH WALES GUITAR SOCIETY

Charity number: 1001407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £548 £710 £665 £832 £1.11k
Total expenditure £335 £565 £504 £1.09k £742
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A