Accounts and annual returns PONTNEWYNYDD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1001534
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 May 2025 460 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 September 2022 230 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 September 2022 687 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required