Accounts and annual returns DUNKIRK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1001575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 21 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 21 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 17 April 2024 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 16 June 2023 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 16 June 2023 108 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 16 June 2023 473 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 16 June 2023 473 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 04 March 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required