Trustees TRAFALGAR SCHOOLS PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1001584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ieva Mansbridge Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Nicola Goddard-Moulton Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Joanne Behenna Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Tara Rees Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Sarah Keefe Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Nicola Toner Trustee 08 October 2020
None on record
Jamie Allen Trustee 08 October 2020
None on record
Jenny Sparflo Trustee 08 October 2020
None on record
Laura Jennings Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record