Accounts and annual returns THE KATHARINE GOODISON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1001646
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2008 12 February 2009 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2007 29 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not submitted