Financial history THE BRADFORD WEST RIDING CHARITABLE SOCIETY TRUST

Charity number: 1002027
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 20/04/2014 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £5.40k £9.59k £4.64k £5.89k £4.08k
Total expenditure £400 £5.30k £3.55k £7.25k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A