Financial history SOUTH EAST ESSEX CHINESE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1002097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.61k £7.10k £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k
Total expenditure £4.97k £7.11k £10.39k £11.26k £10.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A