Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE LONDON HOSPITAL (ST CLEMENT'S)

Charity number: 1002211
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £11.56k £19.42k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £27.51k £20.45k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A