Accounts and annual returns WOMENSPACE

Charity Number: 1002621
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 27 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 07 February 2007 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 22 August 2007 203 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 28 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 12 May 2005 101 days late