Accounts and annual returns THE CLAIRE HUNTER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1002794
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 17 February 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 20 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required