Accounts and annual returns DAVID LIVINGSTONE MEMORIAL HEALTH CARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1002863
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 10 May 2006 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 21 March 2005 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required