Accounts and annual returns HILDEN GRANGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1002977
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 17 August 2024 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 16 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 June 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 June 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 10 June 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 June 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 June 2020 30 days late Download Open in new window