Accounts and annual returns THE MARIA GREY NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1002985
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 14 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 14 December 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 June 2020 On Time