Financial history HIGH/SCOPE UK

Charity number: 1003156
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £265.60k £317.01k £280.95k £90.86k £97.99k
Total expenditure £315.62k £328.58k £241.36k £186.81k £112.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A