Accounts and annual returns GKN SANKEY EMPLOYEES' CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 1003217
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 02 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 June 2021 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 October 2020 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required