Accounts and annual returns RINGMER NURSERY SCHOOL
Charity number: 1003220
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 November 2016 | 27 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 November 2016 | 27 March 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 09 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | 28 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 16 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | 03 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 16 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | 18 November 2013 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window