Accounts and annual returns DEWSBURY AMBULANCE CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1003679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 07 April 2025 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 07 April 2025 372 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 02 July 2023 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required