Accounts and annual returns FELIX CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1003930
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2019 29 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 28 May 2019 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 28 May 2019 89 days late
Annual return 30 April 2017 16 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required