Financial history FRIENDS OF THE REDWELL MEDICAL CENTRE

Charity Number: 1003976
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2009 30/06/2010 30/06/2011 30/06/2012 30/06/2013
Total gross income £599 £200 £10 £63 £45
Total expenditure £9.32k £465 £111 £0 £1.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A